THE SIKH CHANNEL COMMUNITY BROADCASTING COMPANY LIMITED


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has published a report Open in new window on its inquiry into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES EDUCATION/ TRAINING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 02 June 2010: Standard registration
- THE SIKH CHANNEL (Working name)
- THE SIKH CHANNEL BROADCASTING COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gurpreet Kaur Sandhu | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Satnam Singh Bal | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.64m | £1.09m | £877.50k | £910.93k | £480.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46m | £1.34m | £896.05k | £916.44k | £677.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £41.93k | £56.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.62m | £1.06m | £780.11k | £853.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £17.85k | £30.89k | £55.39k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £19 | £12 | £69 | £989 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £41.93k | £56.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.41m | £1.30m | £872.68k | £916.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.89k | £46.36k | £23.37k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £36.01k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 301 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 301 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2023 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2023 | 345 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 October 2020 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 October 2020 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF SIKH RELIGION AND SIKH COMMUNITY. TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS OF THE SIKH FAITH RELIGION BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING THE TEACHINGS FROM THE SHIRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB AND THE 10 GURUS MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 3
24 AVENUE ROAD
ASTON
BIRMINGHAM
B6 4DY
B6 4DY
- Phone:
- 01213801050
- Email:
- info@sikhchannel.tv
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window