Financial history LINCOLNSHIRE RURAL SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1137678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £301.30k £284.06k £357.80k £442.73k £460.76k
Total expenditure £151.69k £173.22k £257.62k £304.37k £361.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £93.70k £55.97k £129.69k £114.44k £142.92k