LINCOLNSHIRE RURAL SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity organises a group of volunteers and staff to give support to individuals who are finding difficulty in coping with stressful situations in rural lincolnshire, provides a Health Screening service in Louth and Newark livestock markets and operates a telephone helpline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £142,921 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
61 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 31 August 2010: Standard registration
- 21 November 2011: Funds received from 1096714 LINCOLNSHIRE RURALSUPPORT NETWORK
- LRSN (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Phillips | Chair | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jane Dunn | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Alexander Godfrey | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Hawes | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Michelle Boileau | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Michael Rayner Holt BscDipFMMB | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
THE REV CANON ALAN JOHN ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.30k | £284.06k | £357.80k | £442.73k | £460.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.69k | £173.22k | £257.62k | £304.37k | £361.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £93.70k | £55.97k | £129.69k | £114.44k | £142.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 JUNE 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 15 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 NOV 2019 as amended on 19 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE RURAL COMMUNITY OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincolnshire Showground
Grange-De-Lings
LINCOLN
LN2 2NA
- Phone:
- 07725203560
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window