ONE

Charity Number: 1136255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The activities of ONE are for the benefit of the general public and are undertaken as the Church Council feels fit. They are: a, to advance the Christian Faith. b, to help relieve sickness and financial hardship as well as promoting and preserving good health by the provision of funds, goods and services. c, to help advance and support education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £59,515
Total expenditure: £56,801

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington
  • Durham
  • Burkina Faso
  • Namibia
  • South Africa
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
  • 31 January 2020: Funds received from 1123731 OAKS OF RIGHTEOUSNESS CHURCH
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • DARLINGTON VINEYARD (Working name)
  • MOSAIC CHURCH (DARLINGTON) (Working name)
  • MOSAIC CHURCH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Smith Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Lesley Witherden Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Mari-Lize Aucamp Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Lourens Aucamp Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Michael Smith Trustee 11 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.04k £37.99k £43.57k £56.86k £59.52k
Total expenditure £31.86k £39.91k £41.36k £50.24k £56.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Aldgrove Way
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 0GR
Phone:
+447863225095
Website:

mosaic-church.co.uk