THE CAXTON PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Theatrical Society providing the facillities for drama and performance to the general public for Adults & Young people of all ethnic origins whether able or disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 May 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Mayne | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Marie Dodds | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Stretton | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hammond Ian | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Shepherd | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Till | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Bennett-Ryan | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Till | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Byron Young | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WILSON | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.27k | £74.91k | £86.08k | £94.72k | £164.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.53k | £122.11k | £81.15k | £92.96k | £89.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.70k | £42.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/10/1969 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/1989 AS AMENDED ON 28/02/1991 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 03/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2015 as amended on 04 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF ADVANCING, ESPECIALLY IN GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES, EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA MIME DANCE SINGING ELOCUTION AND MUSIC IN THEIR VARIOUS ASPECTS, AND EITHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERA-TION WITH OTHERS, TO ORGANISE, PERFORM, PRODUCE OR PROMOTE THE STUDY OF SUCH DRAMAS, OPERAS, OPERATTAS, BURLESQUES, MIMES, FILMS, BROADCASTS, MUSIC, BALLETS, ENTERTAINMENTS, DISPLAYS, EXHIBITIONS, DANCING, PUPPET SHOWS, RECITATIONS, READINGS, LECTURES, AND TO DO ALL OTHER THINGS, WETHER UPON SOCIETY PREMISES OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Blakeney Lea
CLEETHORPES
DN35 0PD
- Phone:
- 01472211103
- Email:
- caxton.theatre@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window