THE MATTHEW ELVIDGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1135668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Objectives of The Matthew Elvidge Trust are to: - increase the awareness of depression, its signs and behaviours - equip and train people, who are best placed to identify those at risk from depression - encourage and help young people, who are suffering from depression to seek professional help - reduce the stigma of depression

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,524
Total expenditure: £22,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hamish Murray Andrew Elvidge Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ODIHAM
Received: On time
Henry Chandler Trustee 18 November 2018
None on record
Julia Amanda Fairbairn Trustee 29 June 2014
None on record
CHARLES RAYNER Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
CHARLOTTE EMILY SUSAN ELVIDGE Trustee
None on record
DAVID HAMISH MICHAEL ELVIDGE BA Trustee
None on record
LINDA SUSAN ELVIDGE Trustee
None on record
DOUGLAS MURRAY HUBERT ELVIDGE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.36k £19.52k £21.31k £24.93k £3.52k
Total expenditure £40.95k £30.96k £25.02k £30.00k £22.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ARROW LANE HOUSE
ARROW LANE
HARTLEY WINTNEY
HOOK
RG27 8LR
Phone:
01252842706