LINK 4 LIFE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Link 4 Life Project Charitable Trust seeks to 1. Support relief of poverty & promotion of good health in southern Africa through charitable organizations working in Africa 2. Support the churches' work (of all denominations) among young people in the parish of Great Wyrley and the Diocese of Lichfield 3.Help young people by supporting educational visits to Christian projects in Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- South Africa
Governance
- 13 July 2010: Standard registration
- LINK FOR LIFE PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD WESTWOOD | Chair | 29 June 2010 |
|
|||||
Sophie Cook | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Scarlett | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yasmine Morson- Mills | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Molly May Jones | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Kearsey | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HOBBIS | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stacy Knight | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FORRESTER EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.39k | £3.58k | £1.10k | £22.28k | £747 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.69k | £3.88k | £5.52k | £21.85k | £5.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE PUBLIC IN SOUTHERN AFRICA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CHARITABLE CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN AFRICA. 2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUAL CHURCHES BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD, ESPECIALLY THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES OF ALL DENOMINATIONS IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT WYRLEY , ENGLAND. 3) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE (AGED 25 AND UNDER) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO LIVE, WORK OR ARE EDUCATED IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT WYRLEY, ENGLAND THROUGH SUPPORT, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS AIM. THE CHARITY WILL ALSO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION VISITS TO OVERSEAS PROJECTS, SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE CHARITY UNDER IT'S FIRST AND SECOND OBJECTS (ABOVE)
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN AFRICA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
158a High Street
Chasetown
BURNTWOOD
WS7 3XG
- Phone:
- 01543682336
- Email:
- link4lifeproject@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window