Financial history OLD HEATH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1135547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £31.43k £28.74k £18.18k £15.75k £19.89k
Total expenditure £16.50k £11.51k £24.32k £22.20k £13.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.35k £22.91k N/A N/A N/A