MOSS SIDE VILLAGE PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE NURSERY AND ALSO BREAKFAST AND AFTER SCHOOL FACILITIES FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. PLAY ACTIVITIES ARE PLANNED AROUND AND LINKED INTO THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE (EYFS) KEY THEMES AND COMMITMENTS. RESOURCES ARE PROVIDED FOR A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES PROMOTING DIFFERENT SKILLS. WE ALSO TRY TO ENSURE THAT DIFFERENT RACES, CULTURES, SPECIAL NEEDS AND RELIGIONS ARE REPRESENTED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 April 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 April 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KERSTHINE WEBSTER | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Walsh | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wilson | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.27k | £85.46k | £72.27k | £75.08k | £111.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.71k | £77.04k | £64.31k | £60.46k | £97.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 April 2025 | 446 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
10 March 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 April 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
28 April 2022 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
The aims of the pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas (c) instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY CENTRE
DUNKIRK LANE
LEYLAND
LANCASHIRE
PR26 7SN
- Phone:
- 07561170378
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window