Financial history GATEWAY VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP NORWICH

Charity Number: 1135206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £246.02k £380.77k £312.05k £986.85k £337.76k
Total expenditure £245.66k £219.24k £275.87k £389.71k £597.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £65.28k £22.50k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £969.07k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £15.67k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.11k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £356.91k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £10.04k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £16.24k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £32.80k N/A