HAVEN GREEN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1135578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching; believer's baptism; the Communion of the Lord???s Supper; evangelism and mission; teaching, encouragement and inclusion of young people; nurture of Christian disciples; education and training for service; pastoral care; supporting and encouraging charitable social action; encouraging relationships with all Christians.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £308,734
Total expenditure: £324,120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wee Seng Ser Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Dr Karen Leyshon-Sorland Trustee 18 March 2020
HAVEN GREEN BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Robert Malcolm Houghton Trustee 18 March 2020
None on record
Andy Dalton Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
Dave Roissetter Trustee 01 August 2016
HAVEN GREEN BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £248.89k £258.43k £235.76k £288.33k £308.73k
Total expenditure £212.17k £364.69k £262.82k £202.89k £324.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.39k £8.88k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Castlebar Road
Ealing
London
W5 2UP
Phone:
02089982508