THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIDLINGTON WITH HAMPTON POYLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities as parochial church council within the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,982 from 3 government grant(s)
People

24 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 07 September 2019: Funds received from 1080005 KALEIDOSCOPE CHILDREN'S CENTRE
- KIDLINGTON WITH HAMPTON POYLE PCC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Felicity Marie-Louise Scroggie | Chair | 02 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Margaret Evelyn Dee | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Kubat | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cherona Marie Chapman | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marian Knight | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James William Bruce Forman | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Handsley | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Morgan | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ioana Christina Davies | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Anthony Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Anthony Evershed D Phil | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Penelope Sheila Pedley | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott Robert Cheeseman | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN O'HARE | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JONATHAN PEDLEY | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
REV DR SUSANNA JOAN BROUARD | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MEGHANN SARAH HEWETT BA,PGCE | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK CHRISTODOULOU | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MISS P J BURRELL | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JEAN DAY | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TILLY EVERSHED | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN SMITH | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BUCKELDEE | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE HELEN HOBSON | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.30k | £247.22k | £212.77k | £226.84k | £294.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.37k | £253.04k | £183.04k | £221.57k | £241.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.35k | £4.17k | £7.00k | £7.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office
ST JOHN'S CHURCH
St Johns Church
Broadway
KIDLINGTON
OX5 1DD
- Phone:
- 01865375611
- Email:
- office@kidhp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window