Financial history OUGHTIBRIDGE BRASS BAND

Charity Number: 1136486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.18k £21.00k £2.56k £10.90k £19.25k
Total expenditure £7.86k £6.61k £7.81k £24.36k £22.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.30k N/A £2.00k £2.00k