JOSHUA AMADI MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public in accordance with Christian religious beliefs following the doctrines of the Christian bible To advance education of the public in particular but not exclusive to ethnic minority people in money management
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 November 2010: Standard registration
- LIBERTY INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN ORGANISATION (LINCO) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIET CHIOMA AMADI | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER AMADI | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MABEL JOSHUA-AMADI | Trustee | 09 December 2010 |
|
|
||||
IRENE AMADI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IZOGIE OHONBAMU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £465 | £1.12k | £1.46k | £2.57k | £2.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18k | £50 | £940 | £1.30k | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED 9 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN RELIGIONS, BELIEFS AND FOLLOWING THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHRISTIAN BIBLE B TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ETHNIC MINORITY PEOPLE IN 'MONEY MANAGEMENT'
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 59
Park View Court
Roe Green
London
NW9 0PP
- Phone:
- 07985257080
- Email:
- JOSHUAAMADI@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window