Accounts and annual returns EXPAND

Charity number: 1137120
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 February 2025 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 February 2025 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 August 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 August 2024 194 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 June 2022 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 June 2022 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required