EXPAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Expand focuses in Malawi, Africa and facilitates education through infrastructure development and trainings. Having completed construction of a number of schools in the North of Malawi, Expand builds infrastructure such as teacher's houses, blocks, hostels, libraries and IT centres and promoting modern ways of learning for children in its schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Malawi
Governance
- 28 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TANYA CLARKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nebson Chiloko | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
TAMSIN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDAN COSTELLOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.67k | £45.44k | £1.72k | £41.46k | £25.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.29k | £19.46k | £36.00k | £41.50k | £25.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 15 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
"FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF AGE OR GENDER, ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN MALAWI, AFRICA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS: AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION."
Area of benefit
MALAWI,
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 York Road
Montpelier
BRISTOL
BS6 5QF
- Phone:
- 07931740726
- Email:
- tanya.clarke@cplmalawi.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window