EAST RIDING ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It aims to promote interest in archaeology, both in the local area and further a field, through a programme of lectures, excursions, publications and fieldwork.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 June 1971: Standard registration
- E R A S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew John Reeves | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Parr | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Sharon Wilson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Deverell | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Thomas Myers | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alfred Peter Machin Halkon | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.68k | £7.61k | £4.28k | £4.38k | £6.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.03k | £3.13k | £2.20k | £5.45k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF ARCHAEOLOGY IN GENERAL AND THE PRESERVATION, INVESTIGATION, EXCAVATION AND RESTORATION OF ANTIQUITIES IN THE EAST RIDING IN PARTICULAR. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Woodgate Road
HULL
HU5 5AH
- Phone:
- 01482 351288
- Email:
- cparrateras@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window