Financial history APPLETON WISKE PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1136273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.59k £52.04k £63.23k £82.34k £87.38k
Total expenditure £50.34k £53.58k £64.21k £81.52k £75.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A £500 £300