APPLETON WISKE PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ENHANCING THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN THROUGH PROVISION OF LOCAL, AFFORDABLE PRESCHOOL EDUCATION. ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN. OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Taylor | Chair | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Reid | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janice Barnes | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Rennison | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Farrington | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.59k | £52.04k | £63.23k | £82.34k | £87.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.34k | £53.58k | £64.21k | £81.52k | £75.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | £500 | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 October 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 October 2024 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Church View
Baker Street
Appleton Wiske
NORTHALLERTON
North Yorkshire
DL6 2AQ
- Phone:
- 07483875119
- Email:
- aw.preschool@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.