THE INJUSTICE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HUMAN RIGHTS AND GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord JONATHAN PATRICK MOYNIHAN of CHELSEA | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||
Lord Matthew Jim Elliott of Mickel Fell | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £35.01k | £6.75k | £171.15k | £172.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.90k | £780 | £95.86k | £234.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/05/2011 DATED 10/05/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING FUNDS AND MAKING GRANTS TO SECURE LEGAL ADVICE ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 CHELSEA SQUARE
LONDON
SW3 6LH
- Phone:
- 02073766767
- Email:
- info@injustice.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window