CALEB 14:24 MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leadership development activities across all sectors and broadly christian organizations helping equip and train leaders for service within those organizations and across the communities they serve. Delivering training programs and organizational development consultancies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 31 August 2010: Standard registration
- CALEB MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GARY SPENCER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Timothy-John Oliver | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Wyn Rees | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|||||
John Theuns | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Arthur Burns | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV KENNETH WILLIAM ALFRED IVESON DIP TH | Trustee | 29 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Martin Allen | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.33k | £23.82k | £15.80k | £33.07k | £18.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.02k | £19.93k | £21.05k | £33.11k | £21.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 26 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND BY PROVIDING CHRISTIAN TEACHING, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brooklyn
Brookfield Estate
Ynysybwl
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 3HD
- Phone:
- 01443268123
- Email:
- admin@caleb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window