CHESTERTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for community centres, especially St Andrew's Hall, Chesterton, and community activities in East and West Chesterton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE CUTTING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachel Joan Clarke | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Richards | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Florence Jane Bayles | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
JAN MENTHA | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £6.61k | £4.47k | £6.37k | £4.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.25k | £6.69k | £3.45k | £2.99k | £11.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2021 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) SUPPORT THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF ST ANDREW'S HALL, ST ANDREW'S ROAD, CHESTERTON, AS A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR CHESTERTON (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED, THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE THE WARDS OF EAST CHESTERTON AND WEST CHESTERTON AND THE ADJACENT NEIGHBOURHOODS IN CAMBRIDGE CITY AND SOUTH CAMBRIDGESHIRE DISTRICT IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews Hall
97 St. Andrews Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 1DH
- Phone:
- 01223306150
- Email:
- confirmation@mentha.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window