HIKMAH CULTURAL CENTRE (MANCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a drop-in advice and information. Training centre. Work with the statutory and voluntary bodies. Provide translation,interpretation work. Provide outreach work for the most vulnerable members of the community. Preserve the culture and history of the Somali community Target underachieving children Work with Adult Education. Engage with young people by providing youth activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 21 June 2010: Standard registration
- OGADEN COMMUNITY OF GREATER MANCHESTER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDISHAKUR ABDULLAHI KALIF | Chair | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anis Mohamed Ali | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Sufi | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
AHMED ISSADDIN HAJI | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fartum Abaas Mohamed | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.64k | £25.00k | £6.94k | £14.58k | £23.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.65k | £17.00k | £16.68k | £19.09k | £25.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUGUST 2009 as amended on 30 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN GREATER MANCHESTER, ESPECIALLY THE OGADEN COMMUNITY, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS 2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AS AFORESAID BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 St. Bride Street
Old Trafford
Manchester
M16 9LS
- Phone:
- 0161 226 6888
- Email:
- info@ocgm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window