YOUTH OUTREACH STOURPORT

Charity Number: 1136865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose and activities of our organisation are centred on reaching out to the young people of Stourport, providing diversionary activities to attend and places to go. This involves working in partnership with many organisations to ensure that young people have the best possible opportunities for development.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £3,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YORS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY CATLOW Chair
None on record
Phil Wilkinson Trustee 21 May 2014
None on record
ALAN DAVID WALKER Trustee
None on record
MRS JO DILLISTONE Trustee
None on record
PHILIP KEARNEY Trustee
None on record
MILKA RUSSELL Trustee
WYRE FOREST YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Whalley Avenue
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 5NE
Phone:
01782848699
Website:

No information available