Accounts and annual returns BYLCHAU PARISH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 1135387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 June 2024 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 April 2022 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 April 2022 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required