COMMUNITIES FOR CHANGE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community for Change (CfC) is at the heart of the NAPPC???s work in Sierra Leone. CfCs are small groups of people who work together in small projects that deliver social, cultural or economic benefits underpinned by agreed values and behaviours different from those that are current in the society... These values and behaviours are Commitment, Honesty, Unity, Merit, Self-Reliance (CHUMS).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 11 August 2010: Standard registration
- 26 March 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1134473 LIFELINE NETWORK INTERNATIONAL
- NAPPC (UK) (Working name)
- NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR PEACE AND POSITIVE CHANGE (UK) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £2.16k | £2.13k | £6.40k | £2.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.28k | £2.03k | £1.50k | £0 | £3.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 10 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 14 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUG 2010 AS AMENDED ON 26 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF SIERRA LEONE BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window