CHILDREN FIRST FAMILY MEDIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A specialist not for profit family mediation service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £76,397 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Standard registration
- CFFM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oluwashina Esther Aluko | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Bradshaw | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Hannah Gaskell | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.49k | £146.76k | £113.45k | £104.71k | £128.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.20k | £122.82k | £128.71k | £117.29k | £104.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £64.41k | £70.74k | £58.62k | £30.20k | £76.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 7 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY PROVIDING SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION FOR PEOPLE INVOLVED OR LIKELY TO BE INVOLVED IN DISPUTE, THE BREAK-UP OF MARRIAGE OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES DURING DIVORCE AND SEPARATION THROUGH SUPPORT WORK AND THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY AND SIGNPOSTING"
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Business Lodge
Europa House
Barcroft Street
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 5BT
- Phone:
- 01617638793
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window