THE NEW ROOM/JOHN WESLEY'S CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote as a place of historical & contemporary significance in the spiritual & social life of Bristol, the nation & the world. Tell of the Wesleys & their contribution & relevance to thought, belief & action today. Develop a sustainable heritage attraction, educational resource, cultural venue & community facility. Offer opportunities for reflection,challenge & spiritual encounter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Clifford Michael Friend | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Marcus Torchon Dr | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Martin Wellings | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sharon Lovelock | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Ivan Fowler | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Teddy Kalongo | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Dr Jonathan Hustler | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY RICHARD GOLLOP OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL ROSE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Rev DAVID WEEKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Anthony Ward Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Eleanor Jane Allin | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £464.04k | £446.71k | £330.77k | £316.85k | £381.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £414.11k | £359.19k | £375.94k | £469.47k | £550.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN WESLEY'S NEW ROOM
36 THE HORSEFAIR
BRISTOL
BS1 3JE
- Phone:
- 01179264740
- Email:
- info@newroombristol.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window