Accounts and annual returns CHILDRENS SOCCER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1137710
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 December 2016 On Time