CHILDRENS SOCCER ACADEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Children's Soccer Academy (CSA) is a registered charity (No: 1137710) with the objective of the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of West Berkshire, North Hampshire and Reading aged between two and eighteen by the provision of facilities for playing football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
- 21 October 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 21 October 2019: Funds transferred to 1178637 CSA 07 FOOTBALL CLUB
- CSA AND CSA 07 FC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.40k | £33.80k | £37.11k | £36.98k | £32.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.40k | £33.68k | £37.20k | £37.07k | £39.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 17 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 23 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
23 December 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 01 APR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 2 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST BERKSHIRE, READING AND NORTH HAMPSHIRE AGED BETWEEN TWO AND EIGHTEEN BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL
Area of benefit
WEST BERKSHIRE, READING AND NORTH HAMPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window