BEDFORD STREET ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To train and organise one or more teams of volunteers (known as Street Angels) drawn from local Christian churches to patrol the streets of Bedford town centre and to give support to those that are vulnerable in the night-time economy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
Governance
- 26 August 2010: Standard registration
- BSA (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Anne Woodburn | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DENNY | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN NIGEL SACKETT | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY HINSON | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|||||
FRANCES ELEANOR GILL | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH DUNIGAN | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYNNE DAWN ROBERTS | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES CHISWELL | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74k | £1.81k | £1.31k | £2.31k | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.64k | £1.72k | £2.62k | £2.99k | £2.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 JULY 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 19 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SERVING THE PUBLIC WORKING IN, FREQUENTING OR VISITING THE TOWN CENTRE OF BEDFORD, AND BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FORMATION OF THE STREET ANGELS PROGRAMME. (B) TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEDFORD, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT. (C) TO SUPPORT, CARE AND TREAT PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS AND SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDITION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Merchant Gate
Riverside Square
BEDFORD
MK40 1AS
- Phone:
- 01234327365
- Email:
- t.moisey3@gmail.com
- Website:
-
bedfordstreetangels.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window