ARTS AROUND MANSFIELD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'arts around mansfield' has provided a platform for local artists from Mansfield to establish and/or promote themselves. It has set up a website for all members to promote their activities. It has set up a number of networking meetings and events for artists and the public to meet each other and to see their work. The range is broad, encompassing visual and performing artists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 01 June 1971: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE MANSFIELD AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION FOR THE ARTS (Previous name)
- THE MANSFIELD ARTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £1.22k | £2.94k | £1.09k | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £5.23k | £3.84k | £7.97k | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 12 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 18 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 30 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 1971 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 1999 AND 26 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER, PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND TO HEIGHTEN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE DISTRICT OF MANSFIELD.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF MANSFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window