THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S PAINSWICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship, charitable grants and maintenance of a historic church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST MARY'S PAINSWICK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Burt | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Gay | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Haslam | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Allen | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Judith Lindley | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Warner | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Watson | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Rawson | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY GARDINER | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DYLAN HAROLD DAVIES | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|||||
KAREN GODDARD | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SWAIN | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Leach | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.59k | £173.10k | £183.60k | £268.68k | £140.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.92k | £129.39k | £145.82k | £457.53k | £143.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lychgate
Stroud Road
Painswick
Stroud
GL6 6UT
- Phone:
- 01452 814795
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window