LANCING AND SOMPTING U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HAVE A NUMBER OF INTEREST GROUPS WHICH ARE RUN BY MEMBERS AND THESE GROUPS HOLD MEETINGS ON A REGULAR BASIS.MEETINGS ARE HELD EITHER IN MEMBER'S HOMES (SMALL GROUPS), OR IN A VARIETY OF PUBLIC MEETING ROOMS/HALLS - GIVING ACCESS TO AS MANY AS POSSIBLE. GENERAL MEETINGS ARE HELD MONTHLY AT A LARGER VENUE AND GUEST SPEAKERS INVITED AT REASONABLE COST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
- LANCING & SOMPTING U3A (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Tuck | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Garry Purnell | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARION WOOD | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Leaney | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Betteridge | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Paul Dilly | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Fay Roberts | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.44k | £3.81k | £2.32k | £7.15k | £7.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.04k | £3.26k | £3.15k | £5.16k | £5.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 14 APR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 10 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
LANCING AND SOMPTING
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Furze Road
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN13 3BH
- Phone:
- 01903691858
- Email:
- secretary.LandSu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window