TIN CAN CAMP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Play and summer camping activities for inner city children & young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 December 2010: Standard registration
- KIDSCAMP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JEFFERY PID | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Munday | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alfie Ridge | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Koerfa | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Dove | Trustee | 17 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Phydellis Rochester | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM THOMAS CONDON | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAUREN DALEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09k | £5.12k | £6.13k | £8.70k | £971 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.31k | £1.84k | £6.86k | £8.60k | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 July 2024 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: 1) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 58
John Ratcliffe House
Chippenham Gardens
London
NW6 5LH
- Phone:
- 02073721906
- Email:
- tincancamp@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window