ANTI CASTE DISCRIMINATION ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To monitor and oppose caste discrimination practices or policies, which result in and perpetuate caste prejudice in the UK and abroad 2) To raise awareness of caste discrimination and its causes 3) To take steps to involve all interested people in uniting against caste discrimination, including but not limited to provision of relevant education to those who need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Standard registration
- ACDA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Santosh Dass MBE | Chair | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tarsem Kalyan | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAJ CHAND | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|||||
SAT PAUL | Trustee | 28 August 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.16k | £21.58k | £25.58k | £20.18k | £11.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £578 | £0 | £5.70k | £8.75k | £8.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF CASTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A. MONITORING AND EXPOSING CASTE DISCRIMINATION IN THE UK AND ABROAD; B. RAISING AWARENESS OF CASTE DISCRIMINATION AND ITS CAUSES; C. INVOLVING INTERESTED PEOPLE IN UNITING AGAINST CASTE DISCRIMINATION; D. PLANNING STRATEGIES AND HELPING SUPPORT GROUPS TO RESPOND TO CASTE DISCRIMINATION IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE; E. PROVIDING MORAL RELIEF TO VICTIMS OF CASTE DISCRIMINATION THROUGH SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES. TO UNDERTAKE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACDA c/o Dr R Chand
Garden City Surgery
57-59 Station Road
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 3BJ
- Phone:
- 07710888424
- Email:
- infoacda@googlemail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window