BLACON YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blacon Youth Football Club provides the opportunity for young people both boys & girls between the ages of 6 to 16 inclusive to participate in football activities. This activity gives the young people the opportunity to play in a team sport which provides discipline and respect and gives them enjoyment, fun and fitness in a friendly and secure environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 20 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Pryce | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON HARDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.62k | £28.34k | £25.33k | £25.98k | £36.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.08k | £28.32k | £26.17k | £26.04k | £35.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 759 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 759 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1124 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1124 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1489 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1489 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 DURHAM ROAD
BLACON
CHESTER
CH1 5BN
- Phone:
- 07960173470
- Email:
- janepryce286@gmail.com
- Website:
-
blaconyouth.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window