RGA USER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vacuum is a key enabling technology for a wide variety of applications that are of growing importance in the 21st Century. An annual 2-day meeting is organised by the Charity, providing a unique opportunity for networking and education, in addition to topical presentations and training of interest to all vacuum users. Visit www.vacuum-uk.org for full information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 2010: Standard registration
- VACUUM SYMPOSIUM UK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR STEVE SHANNON BSC, PHD, CPHYS, MINSTP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark David Pendleton | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN HATHAWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOE HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR SUNIL PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.51k | £0 | £576 | £8.77k | £9.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.84k | £1.93k | £653 | £1.67k | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING AND APPLICATION THROUGH AN ANNUAL MEETING AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 East Street
Thame
OX9 3JS
- Phone:
- 01844212202
- Email:
- info@vacuum-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window