ASSOCIATION OF BREAST SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEMBERSHIP ASSOCIATION FOR HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS WORKING IN THE TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER AND BENIGN BREAST DISEASE. THE ASSOCIATION ORGANISES EDUCATIONAL EVENTS, PRODUCES GUIDELINES AND OTHER PUBLICATIONS, PROMOTES NATIONAL AUDITS AND TRIALS AND UPDATES ITS MEMBERS AND OTHERS ON CHANGES IN CURRENT PRACTICE AND OTHER RELEVANT NEWS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£964,455
Donations and legacies | £3.96k | |
Charitable activities | £947.24k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £13.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£983,704
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £983.70k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £983.70k |
People

3 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leena Chagla | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Ruth Ann Reed James | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Henry James Cain | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Carol-Ann Courtney | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Kathryn Susan Ellis | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Cliona Clare Kirwan | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Isabella Carmen Freda Karat | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Steven Thrush | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Raghavan Vidya | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sue Kim Down | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Yazan Adnan Jadallah Masannat | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Tracey Elizabeth Irvine | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Karina Cox | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Prof Lynda Wyld | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Elizabeth Downey | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £836.49k | £351.81k | £496.78k | £946.03k | £964.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £798.90k | £358.80k | £396.97k | £788.97k | £983.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £35.66k | N/A | N/A | £35.08k | £3.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £796.79k | N/A | N/A | £908.49k | £947.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.49k | N/A | N/A | £2.47k | £13.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.55k | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £798.90k | N/A | N/A | £788.97k | £983.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.06k | N/A | N/A | £14.65k | £14.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £60.14k | N/A | N/A | £17.94k | £22.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.25k | N/A | N/A | £13.40k | £13.96k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £680.12k | N/A | N/A | £931.50k | £888.83k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £179.25k | N/A | N/A | £189.89k | £167.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 JUN 2016 as amended on 18 Jun 2018 as amended on 15 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE PRACTICE OF BREAST SURGERY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 4.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND TRAINING IN RELATION TO BREAST CONDITIONS AND BREAST SURGERY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
at The Royal College of Surgeons of
England
38-43 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02078696852
- Email:
- lucydavies@absgbi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window