Financial history BOIS GOETRE-HEN A'R CYLCH

Charity Number: 1135970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.14k £11.37k £14.63k £15.17k £24.38k
Total expenditure £16.40k £7.90k £10.58k £14.81k £16.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A