DAYBREAKS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING AND PROMOTION OF AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF RETIRED AND RESCUED GREYHOUNDS. USE OF FUNDS RAISED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, AND TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE KENNELS FOR THE CARE OF SUCH DOGS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Jane Locke | Chair | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Aubrey Tobias Arrowsmith | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Sambrook | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Fryer | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Plackowski | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Woolmington | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Scholey | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.97k | £197.27k | £173.68k | £143.81k | £225.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.12k | £115.53k | £151.85k | £190.92k | £233.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16/04/2011 as amended on 19 Jan 2025 as amended on 05 May 2025
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE KENNELS FOR THE CARE OF SUCH DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daybreaks Kennels
10 Coventry Road
Elmdon
Birmingham
B26 3QS
- Phone:
- 01217827702
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window