KRESY-SIBERIA (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop and maintain the publicly available on-line Kresy-Siberia Virtual Musuem (www.Kresy-Siberia.org), dedicated to preserving and promoting the history of Poland's citizens fighting for freedom and survival in eastern Poland and in forced exile during World War II. Record interviews with Survivors, digitise photos and documents, hold events, and help with family research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2010: Standard registration
- 30 April 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- "KRESY-SIBERIA" OR "KRESY-SYBERIA" OR "KRESY-SIBERIA VIRTUAL MUSEUM" ("KSVM") (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.31k | £19.40k | £19.98k | £4.76k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.39k | £21.14k | £19.84k | £2.69k | £3.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 22 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 13 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BU SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ESTABLISH EDUCATION AND MAINTAIN AN INTERNET-BASED MUSEUM, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, RELATING TO THE EXPERIENCES OF POLISH CITIZENS UNDER OCCUPATION AND IN EXILE DURING AND AFTER WORLD WAR II.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window