THE KNOWLEDGE (AL MAARIFA) SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
our charity act a resource relieve the needs of children & relieve the needs of children and young people principally but not exclusively those living in Acton & surrounding areas by assisting in such as the trustees think fit whose aims are advancing education by developing the children & young people through mental ,physical & moral capabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 06 July 2010: Standard registration
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 March 2013: Re-registered
- 07 August 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/09/2011 | 25/09/2012 | 25/09/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2013 | 30 August 2014 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2012 | 28 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2011 | 28 March 2013 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AN EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AGE 5-18 THROUGH A WEEKEND SUPPORT SCHOOL. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR, AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE LIVING IN ACTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS , BY ASSISTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, WHOSE AIMS ARE ADVANCING EDUCATION BY DEVELOPING THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH MENTAL, PHYSICAL MORAL CAPABILITIES, THROUGH ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
ACTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window