THE COMMUNITY AND YOUTH MUSIC LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of amateur and educational music-making throughout the United Kingdom by means of a lending library of musical scores.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- CYM LIBRARY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Raymond Whitnall | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Haslam | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lambert Rathbone | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY JACKMAN | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Mary Sylvia Hellen | Trustee | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ASHCROFT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.87k | £7.78k | £12.86k | £18.45k | £21.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.38k | £5.70k | £16.74k | £19.80k | £15.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 26 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY OF MUSICAL SCORES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Hornsey Library
Haringey Park
London
N8 9JA
- Phone:
- 020 3602 5214
- Email:
- cymlibrary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window