Financial history WE CAN DANCE

Charity number: 1136698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £19.09k £32.13k £16.50k £44.76k £55.72k
Total expenditure £8.90k £32.06k £27.80k £32.90k £35.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A