Financial history THE FOXGLOVE TRUST

Charity number: 1137839
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £44.75k £14.95k £18.43k £22.01k £24.64k
Total expenditure £152.75k £73.54k £152.28k £125.46k £5.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A