MIDLANDS ANIMAL RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE VETERINARY TREATMENT FOR RESCUED ANIMALS IN OUR CARE BEFORE REHOMING IN VETTED HOMES. WE HAVE A STRICT NON DESTRUCTION POLICY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 July 1971: Standard registration
- M A R T (Working name)
- ALBRIGHTON ANIMAL RESCUE TEAM (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Hill | Chair | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Corbett | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN E WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.90k | £161.71k | £153.24k | £132.74k | £70.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.12k | £74.69k | £95.06k | £100.75k | £126.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1971 AS AMENDED AUGUST 1985 AND 7 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY HEREAFTER BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS, STAFFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE, WORCESTER AND SHROPSHIRE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION DATED 7 JUNE 1993)
Area of benefit
MIDLANDS AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
17 Park Road
Walsall
WS5 3JU
- Phone:
- 01213580251
- Email:
- MARTEILEENW@GOOGLEMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window