THE GOSPEL FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL (GOFAMINT)UK BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Provision of Weekly Church Services on Sunday to minister to the physical, spiritual and material needs of the congregants. 2. Provision of Special Events and Meetings to meet the specific needs of target groups in the Church such as Men, Women, Youth and Children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
Governance
- 09 May 2011: Standard registration
- GOFAMINT (Working name)
- THE GOSPEL FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL (GOFAMINT) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LAWRENCE OLANIYI | Chair | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christianah George | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roland Ayodeji Alade | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
SIMEON OLAREWAJU | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIJAH OLUDELE ABINA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.37k | £49.31k | £55.74k | £54.52k | £116.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.19k | £49.37k | £56.18k | £48.87k | £88.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2024
(These accounts |
28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/02/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Broxholm Road
LONDON
SE27 0NA
- Phone:
- 02036528433
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window