HOP SKIP AND JUMP (WEST SUSSEX)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hop Skip and Jump West Sussex provides day care to children and young adults with disabilities, life-limiting illnesses or any other special need in Horsham, West Sussex and surrounding counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 April 2010: Standard registration
- 07 March 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £10.19k | £49.88k | £1.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £0 | £193 | £45.82k | £18.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £3.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 10 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 15 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | 15 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING CAUSED TO CHILDREN BY LIFE LIMITING ILLNESSES AND SPECIAL NEEDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- (I) PROVIDING DAY CARE AND SHORT BREAKS TO CHILDREN WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESSES OR SPECIAL NEEDS, AND THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS; (II) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO THE PARENTS AND SIBLINGS OF CHILDREN WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESSES OR SPECIAL NEEDS; AND (III) COLLABORATING WITH OTHER HOP, SKIP AND JUMP REGISTERED CHARITY BRANCHES THROUGHOUT THE UK.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window