KENT FILM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARTS: ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF DISENFRANCHISED TEENAGERS & WHO ARE NOT IN EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION OR TRAINING, (2) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (3) ARTS FACILITATING (4)ENVIRONMENTAL AWARENESS & RESPONSIBILITY FOR YOUTH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,756 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 26 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Carr | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mae Dobson | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Kelly-Thomas | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emlyn Gregory | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Blair | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Shepherd | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.98k | £40.36k | £33.65k | £36.27k | £63.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.63k | £34.11k | £23.92k | £23.88k | £36.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £2.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 March 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 March 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 February 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 February 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 OCTOBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 25 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF DISENFRANCHISED TEENAGERS WHO ARE NOT IN EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION OR TRAINING, IN PARTICULAR, THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, EXPELLED FROM THE EDUCATION SYSTEM, YOUTH OFFENDERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN DANGER OF EXCLUSION AND CRIMINAL BEHAVIOUR, BY THE PROVISION OF A FILM AND MEDIA SCHOOL. (2) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.'
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adlam Accountancy Services
22 Grange Road
RAMSGATE
Kent
CT11 9LR
- Phone:
- 07956557450
- Email:
- kentfilmfoundation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window